EP0243341 - Biopsy device for sampling tissue probes and application of substances in one operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMMUNO Aktiengesellschaft Industriestrasse 67 A-1221 Wien / AT | [1991/22] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states IMMUNO Aktiengesellschaft für chemisch-medizinische Produkte Industriestrasse 72 A-1220 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states IMMUNO Aktiengesellschaft für chemisch-medizinische Produkte Industriestrasse 72 A-1220 Wien / AT | ||
For all designated states Dinges, Hans Peter, Dr. Jaritzweg 43 A-8045 Graz / AT | |||
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states Zatloukal, Kurt, Dr. Johann Loserthgasse 2 A-8010 Graz / AT | ||
For all designated states Dinges, Hans Peter, Dr. Jaritzweg 43 A-8045 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zatloukal, Kurt, Dr. Johann Loserthgasse 2 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Dinges, Hans Peter, Dr. Jaritzweg 43 A-8045 Graz / AT | [1988/17] |
Former [1987/44] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wolfram, Gustav Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 87890076.0 | 15.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | AT19860001041 | 21.04.1986 Original published format: AT 104186 | AT19870000914 | 13.04.1987 Original published format: AT 91487 | [1987/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0243341 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0243341 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243341 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, A61B10/00 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
A61B10/0283 (EP);
A61M5/1582 (EP);
A61M25/0032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/44] | Title | German: | Biopsieeinrichtung zur Gewinnung von Gewebeproben und Applikation von Substanzen in einem Arbeitsgang | [1987/44] | English: | Biopsy device for sampling tissue probes and application of substances in one operation | [1987/44] | French: | Dispositif de biopsie pour prélever des échantillons de tissu et appliquer des substances en une opération | [1987/44] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 19.11.1992 | LU | 30.04.1993 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE3522782 ; | [X]EP0107810 ; | [A]FR2326941 |