EP0253802 - Device for spraying cooling fluid from nozzles on a cutter head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.04.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Friedrichstrasse 4 A-1011 Wien / AT | [1988/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöffmann, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Niederungweg 12 A-8704 Leoben / AT | 02 /
Wrulich, Herwig, Ing. Haldenweg 4 A-8740 Zeltweg / AT | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Kretschmer, Adolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. A. Kretschmer Dr. Thomas M. Haffner Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Kretschmer, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. A. Kretschmer Dr. Thomas M. Haffner Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 87890176.8 | 17.07.1987 | [1988/03] | Priority number, date | AT19860001958 | 17.07.1986 Original published format: AT 195886 | [1988/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0253802 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E21C35/22 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
B05B15/50 (EP,US);
E21C35/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | Sprüheinrichtung für Kühlflüssigkeit aus Düsen eines Schrämkopfes | [1988/03] | English: | Device for spraying cooling fluid from nozzles on a cutter head | [1988/03] | French: | Dispositif de pulvérisation pour fluide de refroidissement venant de buses d'une tête de havage | [1988/03] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/25] | 27.01.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]AT381985B (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [AD]EP0040334 (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE3007055 (KRAMPE & CO [DE]); | [AD]GB2050469 (RICH SERVICES INC ROY); | [AD]GB1473267 (HAYDEN NILOS CONFLOW LTD); | [AD]EP0067145 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [AD]EP0067144 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [AD]GB2135715 (PADLEY & VENABLES LTD) |