EP0269609 - A process and an arrangement for gaining electric energy in addition to producing molten pig iron [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH Postfach 26 01 52 40094 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH Postfach 26 01 52 D-40094 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Bogdandy, Ludwig, Prof. Dr. Ing. Jungmairstrasse 8 A-4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
Kepplinger, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Lahholdstrasse 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
Stift, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Parkstrasse 16 A-8700 Leoben / AT | 04 /
Papst, Gero, Dr. Ing. Hesselstrasse 8 D-4044 Kaarst 2 / DE | 05 /
Hauk, Rolf, Dr. Ing. Friedrichstrasse 45 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Wolfram, Gustav Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 87890262.6 | 19.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | AT19860003145 | 25.11.1986 Original published format: AT 314586 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269609 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269609 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C21B13/14, C21B13/00 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
F25J3/04545 (EP,US);
C21B11/00 (KR);
C21B13/0013 (EP,US);
C21B13/002 (EP,US);
C21B13/14 (EP,US);
F25J3/04557 (EP,US);
F25J3/04563 (EP,US);
F25J3/04575 (EP,US);
C21B2100/42 (EP,US);
C21B2100/62 (EP,US);
C21B2100/66 (EP,US);
F25J2240/70 (EP,US);
F25J2240/80 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1988/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Gewinnung von elektrischer Energie neben der Herstellung von flüssigem Roheisen | [1988/22] | English: | A process and an arrangement for gaining electric energy in addition to producing molten pig iron | [1988/22] | French: | Procédé et installation pour l'obtention d'énergie électrique en plus de la production de la fonte liquide | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 08.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2067668 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]EP0010627 ; | [Y]DE3345107 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [Y]EP0139310 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE], et al); | [AD]EP0150340 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [A]DE3418488 (BANDSTAHLKOMBINAT MATERN VEB [DD]); | [A]EP0182775 (VOEST ALPINE AG, et al); | [A]EP0192912 (KORF ENGINEERING GMBH [DE], et al); | [AD]EP0148973 |