Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] |
29.12.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.02.1991 [1991/07] |
13.12.1989 | First examination report | |
04.09.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.10.1989 [1989/43] |
14.06.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |
30.04.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.06.1988 [1988/24] |