EP0272244 - Method and device for determining vibration characteristics and for driving a piezoelectric transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH.Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 8020 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH.Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 A-8020 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harms, Klaus-Christoph, Dr. Attemsgasse 11 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Ruckenbauer, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Lessingstrasse 5 A-8010 Graz / AT | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Pinter, Rudolf Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Pinter, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Klein & Pinter OEG Fasangasse 49 A-1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 87890281.6 | 09.12.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | AT19860003399 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: AT 339986 | [1988/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272244 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272244 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272244 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01H13/00, B06B1/06 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
H04R29/001 (EP,US);
B06B1/0253 (EP,US);
G01H13/00 (EP,US);
H04R29/004 (EP,US);
B06B2201/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Bestimmung von Schwingungseigenschaften sowie zum Betreiben eines piezoelektrischen Wandlers | [1988/25] | English: | Method and device for determining vibration characteristics and for driving a piezoelectric transducer | [1988/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer les caractéristiques des vibrations et pour alimenter un transducteur piézoélectrique | [1988/25] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.12.1992 | SE | 10.12.1992 | CH | 31.12.1992 | LI | 31.12.1992 | [1994/03] |
Former [1994/02] | GB | 09.12.1992 | |
SE | 10.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 10.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]AT369549B (LIST HANS [AT], et al); | [A]US3832630 (MICOL P, et al) |