EP0272246 - Pump, especially a lubrication pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steyr-Daimler-Puch Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 62 Franz-Josefs-Kai 51 A-1011 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 62 Franz-Josefs-Kai 51 A-1011 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states Steyr-Daimler-Puch Aktiengesellschaft Kärntnerring 7 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leitner, Max Madlsederstrasse 11 A-4400 Steyr / AT | [1988/25] | Application number, filing date | 87890288.1 | 15.12.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | AT19860003353 | 17.12.1986 Original published format: AT 335386 | [1988/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272246 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272246 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16N13/10 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
F16N13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | Pumpe, insbesondere Schmierölpumpe | [1988/25] | English: | Pump, especially a lubrication pump | [1988/25] | French: | Pompe, notamment pompe de graissage | [1988/25] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 14.03.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/03] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR901232 ; | [A]US2712478 ; | [A]DE436954 |