EP0252933 - MANUAL CLAMP DEVICE FOR ATTACHMENT TO MACHINE TABLES, DEVICES ETC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISCHER, Matthias Beethovenstrasse 33a D-60325 Frankfurt / DE | [1988/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Braito, Herbert Patentanwalt Widdersteinstrasse 17 88400 Biberach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Braito, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 40 D-88381 Biberach/Riss / DE | Application number, filing date | 87900134.5 | 19.12.1986 | [1988/03] | WO1986EP00765 | Priority number, date | DE19863600010 | 02.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3600010 | DE19863640869 | 29.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3640869 | [1988/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704103 | Date: | 16.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252933 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252933 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/10 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
B25B5/108 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | HANDSPANNVORRICHTUNG ZUM BEFESTIGEN AUF MASCHINENTISCHEN, VORRICHTUNGEN ETC | [1988/03] | English: | MANUAL CLAMP DEVICE FOR ATTACHMENT TO MACHINE TABLES, DEVICES ETC | [1988/03] | French: | BRIDE DE SERRAGE MANUELLE POUR FIXATION AUX TABLES DE MACHINES ET A DES DISPOSITIFS ETC. | [1988/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1987 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.07.1990 | FR | 25.07.1990 | GB | 25.07.1990 | IT | 25.07.1990 | NL | 25.07.1990 | SE | 25.07.1990 | AT | 19.12.1990 | CH | 31.12.1990 | LI | 31.12.1990 | LU | 31.12.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 25.07.1990 | |
GB | 25.07.1990 | ||
IT | 25.07.1990 | ||
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
FR | 14.12.1990 | ||
AT | 19.12.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
LU | 31.12.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 25.07.1990 | |
GB | 25.07.1990 | ||
IT | 25.07.1990 | ||
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
FR | 14.12.1990 | ||
AT | 19.12.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
Former [1992/29] | BE | 25.07.1990 | |
GB | 25.07.1990 | ||
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
FR | 14.12.1990 | ||
AT | 19.12.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
Former [1992/05] | BE | 25.07.1990 | |
GB | 25.07.1990 | ||
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
FR | 14.12.1990 | ||
CH | 31.12.1990 | ||
LI | 31.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/41] | BE | 25.07.1990 | |
GB | 25.07.1990 | ||
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
FR | 14.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/40] | BE | 25.07.1990 | |
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
FR | 14.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | BE | 25.07.1990 | |
NL | 25.07.1990 | ||
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | NL | 25.07.1990 | |
SE | 25.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 25.07.1990 | Cited in | International search | US2729126 [ ] (STANTON JR ARTHUR H, et al); | US2872854 [ ] (HO CHOW); | FR1230092 [ ]; | DE1427091 [ ] (BRUECHER & CO LUDWIG); | GB1599317 [ ] (BOWMAN H P); | US4470586 [ ] (SPENCER PHILIP P [US]) | [X] - Machine Moderne, Vol. 65, No. 743, February 1971, (Paris FR), A. RAMEL: "Outils & l'usinage", pages 27-29, see figure 32; page 27, left hand column |