blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0258275

EP0258275 - BOOM OPERATED DEMOLITION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1988/10]BOOM OPERATED DEMOLITION APPARATUS AND METHOD OF BREAKING COMPOSITE MATERIAL
[1990/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.1991
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.03.1991 [1991/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 N.E. Adams Street
Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/10]For all designated states
CATERPILLAR INC.
100 Northeast Adams Street
Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KISTNER, David
4028 Mohegan Avenue
Dayton, OH 45424 / US
[1988/10]
Representative(s)Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/10]Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date87900576.724.12.1986
[1988/10]
WO1986US02760
Priority number, dateUS1986083148120.02.1986         Original published format: US 831481
[1988/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8705064
Date:27.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0258275
Date:09.03.1988
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1988/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0258275
Date:11.04.1990
Language:EN
[1990/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.1987
ClassificationIPC:E01C23/12, E04G23/08, B28D1/26
[1988/10]
CPC:
E02F3/966 (EP); B25D11/06 (EP); B25D17/28 (EP);
B28D1/26 (EP); E01C23/124 (EP); E04G23/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1988/10]
TitleGerman:AN EINEM AUSLEGER MONTIERBARE ZERTRÜMMERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[1990/15]
English:BOOM OPERATED DEMOLITION APPARATUS[1990/15]
French:APPAREIL DE DEMOLITION ACTIONNE PAR UNE FLECHE[1990/15]
Former [1988/10]AN EINEM AUSLEGER MONTIERBARE ZERTRÜMMERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRECHEN VON ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN MATERIALIEN
Former [1988/10]BOOM OPERATED DEMOLITION APPARATUS AND METHOD OF BREAKING COMPOSITE MATERIAL
Former [1988/10]APPAREIL DE DEMOLITION ACTIONNE PAR UNE FLECHE ET PROCEDE DE CONCASSAGE DE MATERIAUX COMPOSITES
Entry into regional phase30.10.1987National basic fee paid 
30.10.1987Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1987Examination requested  [1988/10]
09.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.10.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.1989Fee for grant paid
21.12.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchUS3319724  [ ];
 US3358779  [ ];
 US2622562  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.