EP0252996 - DEVICE FOR FILTRATION OF LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/03] | PERIODICAL ACTION DEVICE FOR FILTRATION OF LIQUID | ||
[1991/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TREST 'JUZHVODOPROVOD' ul. Gagarina, 135/1 Krasnodar, 350049 / SU | [1988/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHISHKIN, Viktor Vasilievich ul. Festivalnaya, 16-5 Krasnodar, 350049 / SU | 02 /
KRYAZHEVSKIKH, Nikolai Fedorovich ul. Krasnykh partizan, 559-13 Krasnodar, 350049 / SU | 03 /
SHAPOVALOV, Jury Petrovich ul. Turgeneva, 18 Krasnodar, 350049 / SU | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.Ing., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87900741.7 | 17.12.1986 | [1988/03] | WO1986SU00133 | Priority number, date | SU19853988604 | 24.12.1985 Original published format: SU 3988604 | SU19853988605 | 24.12.1985 Original published format: SU 3988605 | SU19853988612 | 24.12.1985 Original published format: SU 3988612 | [1988/03] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703822 | Date: | 02.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252996 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252996 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 02.07.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/11 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
B01D29/27 (EP,US);
B01D29/64 (EP,US);
B01D29/70 (EP,US);
B01D29/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/03] | B01D29/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FILTRATION EINER FLUESSIGKEIT | [1991/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR FILTRATION OF LIQUID | [1991/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE FILTRAGE D'UN LIQUIDE | [1991/31] |
Former [1988/03] | VORRICHTUNG MIT PERIODISCHEM GANG ZUR FILTRATION EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | ||
Former [1988/03] | PERIODICAL ACTION DEVICE FOR FILTRATION OF LIQUID | ||
Former [1988/03] | DISPOSITIF A ACTION PERIODIQUE POUR LE FILTRAGE D'UN LIQUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.1987 | Translation filed | 29.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.1987 | Search fee paid | 29.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 05.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE41969 [ ]; | DE64359 [ ]; | US3254772 [ ] (HORNBOSTEL JR LLOYD); | FR2383130 [ ] (PEYRONNET JEAN [FR]) | International search | [A]US3464561 (WROTNOWSKI ARTHUR C, et al); | [A]DE2124717 ; | [A]US3931015 (JENKINS BERNARD M) |