EP0256078 - LIQUID METERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMATED BACTERIA COUNTING LIMITED 152 Bath Street Glasgow / GB | [1988/31] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states DAMMIT LIMITED 16 Richmond Street Glasgow / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLEFIELD, John Springbank House Campsie Road Kirkintilloch Glasgow / GB | 02 /
JOHNSTON, Robert 44 Merry Green Place Stewarton Ayrshire KA3 5EP / GB | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Fitzpatrick, Alan James, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Fitzpatrick, Alan James, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1988/08] | Wotherspoon, Graham FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 87901080.9 | 02.02.1987 | [1988/08] | WO1987GB00070 | Priority number, date | GB19860002683 | 04.02.1986 Original published format: GB 8602683 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704785 | Date: | 13.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256078 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256078 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01F11/08, G01N1/14 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
G01F11/088 (EP,US);
B01L3/0296 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITS-DOSIERGERÄT | [1988/08] | English: | LIQUID METERING DEVICE | [1988/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE DE LIQUIDE | [1988/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.1990 | BE | 16.08.1990 | CH | 16.08.1990 | LI | 16.08.1990 | NL | 16.08.1990 | SE | 16.08.1990 | LU | 28.02.1991 | [2002/23] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 16.08.1990 | |
BE | 16.08.1990 | ||
CH | 16.08.1990 | ||
LI | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
LU | 28.02.1991 | ||
Former [1991/34] | AT | 16.08.1990 | |
BE | 16.08.1990 | ||
CH | 16.08.1990 | ||
LI | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | AT | 16.08.1990 | |
CH | 16.08.1990 | ||
LI | 16.08.1990 | ||
NL | 16.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/32] | AT | 16.08.1990 | |
CH | 16.08.1990 | ||
LI | 16.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 16.08.1990 | Cited in | International search | US2876934 [ ] (BRIM BERNICE J); | FR2429341 [ ] (INST BIOLOG FIZ [SU]); | US4337879 [ ] (PARK RODNEY W); | GB2098963 [ ] (DOUWE EGBERTS TABAKSFAB); | FR2518505 [ ] (TELLIER ETS L [FR]) |