EP0292491 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO VEHICLE WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.01.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNELL, Thomas Bartlett The Old Sawmills East Coker Yeovil, Somerset BA22 9JJ / GB | [1988/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Lainé, Simon James, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87901083.3 | 03.02.1987 | [1988/48] | WO1987GB00074 | Priority number, date | GB19860002696 | 04.02.1986 Original published format: GB 8602696 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704668 | Date: | 13.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292491 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60B3/16, B60B15/26, F16B37/14 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
B60B3/145 (EP);
B60B15/26 (EP);
B60B3/16 (EP);
F16B35/00 (EP);
F16B37/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG IN BEZIEHUNG ZU KRAFTFAHRZEUGRÄDERN | [1988/48] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO VEHICLE WHEELS | [1988/48] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES ROUES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [1988/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1988 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 19.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 05.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/08] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/08] | Request for further processing for: | 30.05.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.06.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.08.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   04.10.1988 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1989 | 28.02.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.1990 | 28.02.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB257033 [ ] (BUDD WHEEL CO); | FR633632 [ ]; | US3532384 [ ] (WILLIAMS ROBERT E JR); | AT321752B [ ] (SCHERZ KARL, et al); | DE2005428 [ ]; | US2911256 [ ] (CANADY BUEL H, et al); | US3960047 [ ] (LIFFICK FENTON A); | DE2053343 [ ]; | US4387930 [ ] (HUNT MILBY N [US]); | US2311475 [ ] (SCHMEISER THEODORE G) |