EP0257061 - MULTI-PROCESSOR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERARDUCCI, Thomas, Neal 240 Pebbleview Drive Rochester, NY 14612 / US | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Buff, Michel, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Buff, Michel, et al Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87901191.4 | 27.01.1987 | [1988/09] | WO1987US00112 | Priority number, date | US19860827565 | 10.02.1986 Original published format: US 827565 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8704826 | Date: | 13.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257061 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/18, G06F13/36, G06F15/66 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
G06F13/18 (EP);
G06F13/364 (EP);
G06T1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/09] | Title | German: | VIELFACHPROZESSORVORRICHTUNG | [1988/09] | English: | MULTI-PROCESSOR APPARATUS | [1988/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF A PROCESSEUR MULTIPLE | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 23.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/26] | 01.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0131395 [ ]; | US4263649 [ ]; | US4037210 [ ]; | EP0034903 [ ] | [ ] - 1981 IEEE Computer Society Workshop on Computer Architecture for Pattern Analysis and Image Database Management, 11th-13th November 1981, W.H. TSAI et al.,"Architecture of a Multi-Microsprocessor System for Parallel Processing of Image Sequences", pages 104-111see the whole document |