EP0302856 - IMPROVEMENTS IN FERRORESONANT CONSTANT-VOLTAGE TRANSFORMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELEKTRENE S.R.L. Via A. Sforza, 87 I-20141 Milan / IT | [1989/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETROGALLI, Lorenzo Via Pestalozza, 14 I-20131 Milan / IT | [1989/07] | Representative(s) | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 I-20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87901457.9 | 24.02.1987 | [1989/07] | WO1987EP00101 | Priority number, date | IT19860019600 | 28.02.1986 Original published format: IT 1960086 | [1989/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705412 | Date: | 11.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302856 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302856 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/06, H01F31/00 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
G05F3/06 (EP);
H01F30/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/07] | Title | German: | FERRORESONANTE TRANSFORMATOREN MIT KONSTANTER SPANNUNG | [1989/07] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN FERRORESONANT CONSTANT-VOLTAGE TRANSFORMERS | [1989/07] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENT DE TRANSFORMATEURS FERRORESONANTS A TENSION CONSTANTE | [1989/07] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 06.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/07] | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.05.1991 | BE | 15.05.1991 | CH | 15.05.1991 | IT | 15.05.1991 | LI | 15.05.1991 | NL | 15.05.1991 | SE | 15.05.1991 | FR | 04.10.1991 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.05.1991 | |
BE | 15.05.1991 | ||
CH | 15.05.1991 | ||
IT | 15.05.1991 | ||
LI | 15.05.1991 | ||
NL | 15.05.1991 | ||
SE | 15.05.1991 | ||
FR | 04.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/30] | AT | 15.05.1991 | |
BE | 15.05.1991 | ||
CH | 15.05.1991 | ||
LI | 15.05.1991 | ||
NL | 15.05.1991 | ||
SE | 15.05.1991 | ||
FR | 04.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/25] | AT | 15.05.1991 | |
CH | 15.05.1991 | ||
LI | 15.05.1991 | ||
NL | 15.05.1991 | ||
SE | 15.05.1991 | ||
FR | 04.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | AT | 15.05.1991 | |
CH | 15.05.1991 | ||
LI | 15.05.1991 | ||
NL | 15.05.1991 | ||
SE | 15.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/04] | AT | 15.05.1991 | |
NL | 15.05.1991 | ||
SE | 15.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 15.05.1991 | |
SE | 15.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/51] | SE | 15.05.1991 | Cited in | International search | GB1050605 [ ]; | GB1020093 [ ] (FRAKO KONDENSATOREN UND APP BA); | US3708744 [ ] (STEPHENS D, et al); | FR2140038 [ ] (PARLOUR WILLIAM LTD) |