EP0256108 - A QUICKLY ENGAGEABLE-DISENGAGEABLE PIPE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOBBI, Gianfranco Via Fermo, 16 I-60100 Ancona / IT | [1988/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 87901612.9 | 12.02.1987 | [1988/08] | WO1987IT00011 | Priority number, date | IT19860000519U | 13.02.1986 Original published format: IT 51986 U | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705087 | Date: | 27.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256108 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0256108 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/08 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
F16L37/0925 (EP,US);
F16L37/0927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | SCHNELL EIN- UND LOSKUPPELBARE ROHRVERBINDUNG | [1988/08] | English: | A QUICKLY ENGAGEABLE-DISENGAGEABLE PIPE JOINT | [1988/08] | French: | JOINT DE CONDUITE POUVANT S'ENGAGER ET SE DESENGAGER RAPIDEMENT | [1988/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3743326 [ ] (COURTOT L, et al); | US4220361 [ ] (BRANDENBERG KARL A [US]); | DE3008962 [ ] (BARGELE & SOHN KG Y [DE]) |