EP0258455 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN OXYGEN CO. LTD. 16-7, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1988/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Hiroshi 3-6-14, Higashimita Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 214 / JP | 02 /
NAMIKAWA, Hiroshi 6-8-8, Minamiooi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | 03 /
KOGUCHI, Youji 728-4, Tokaichiba Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 227 / JP | 04 /
MIYAKE, Shin-Ichi 8-21-5, Ikegami Oota-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 05 /
IMAYOSHI, Terukazu 4-6-17, Maiokacho Totuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | 06 /
KIKUCHI, Hitoshi 7-2-104, Shimodacho 5-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 223 / JP | 07 /
NAKAMURA, Akihiro 2-4-2, Minamikugahara Oota-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87901656.6 | 27.02.1987 | [1988/10] | WO1987JP00124 | Priority number, date | JP19860043797 | 28.02.1986 Original published format: JP 4379786 | JP19860043798 | 28.02.1986 Original published format: JP 4379886 | [1988/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705285 | Date: | 11.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0258455 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0258455 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.09.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C03B20/00, C03C3/06, C03C1/02 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
C03B20/00 (EP,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,US);
C03C2201/02 (EP,US);
C03C2203/10 (EP,US);
Y10S65/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GLAS | [1988/10] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING GLASS | [1988/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE VERRE | [1988/10] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1987 | Translation filed | 27.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.1987 | Search fee paid | 27.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 11.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0173961 [ ] (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD [JP]) | International search | JPS498638B [ ]; | JPS254388B [ ] |