EP0262184 - A PANEL AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VACUTEK HOLDINGS PTY. LTD. 83-84 Barwon Terrace Geelong, VIC 3220 / AU | [1988/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODDS, William, R. The Cottage Clifton Springs, VIC 3222 / AU | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1988/14] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87902036.0 | 20.03.1987 | [1988/14] | WO1987AU00079 | Priority number, date | AU19860005115 | 20.03.1986 Original published format: AU 511586 | AU19860008753 | 31.10.1986 Original published format: AU 875386 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705650 | Date: | 24.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0262184 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.09.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/26, E04D3/35, B32B5/20 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
B32B5/20 (EP,US);
B29C44/12 (EP);
E04C2/296 (EP);
E04D3/352 (EP);
E04D3/355 (EP);
E04D3/358 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | PANEEL UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1988/14] | English: | A PANEL AND METHOD OF FORMING SAME | [1988/14] | French: | PANNEAU ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1988/14] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1987 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1987 | Search fee paid | 11.12.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 04.04.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/15] | 07.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4075805 ; | [A]US3793789 ; | [A]US4564554 | International search | [X]GB1254993 ; | [X]GB1536876 ; | [X]GB2120166 ; | [X]US2865800 ; | [X]US3309439 ; | [X]US3410044 ; | [X]US3476841 ; | [X]US3608007 ; | [X]US3709965 ; | [X]US3895086 ; | [X]US4038350 ; | [X]US4456706 ; | [X]US4492606 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, 3M411, JP,A, 60-79919 (Mitsubishi Yuka K.K.) 7 May 1985 (07.05.85) |