Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |
26.02.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] |
28.03.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] |
19.04.1989 | First examination report | |
30.01.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] |
30.01.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] |