Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE63542T | 15.06.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP87902041 | 09.03.1987 | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3770085D1 | 20.06.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3770085 | 09.03.1987 | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK169432B | 31.10.1994 | B1 | DK573487D0 | 02.11.1987 | D0 | DK573487 | 02.11.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI92388C | 10.11.1994 | C | FI92388B | 29.07.1994 | B | FI874406 | 07.10.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2199031 | 10.01.1990 | B | GB2199031 | 29.06.1988 | A | GB8725695D0 | 09.12.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU198906 | 28.12.1989 | B | HUT45484 | 28.07.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07107020B | 15.11.1995 | B2 | JPS63502665 | 06.10.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO173440C | 15.12.1993 | C | NO173440B | 06.09.1993 | B | NO874632L | 06.11.1987 | L | NO874632D0 | 06.11.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | DE8700106 | 09.03.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8705294 | Global Dossier | 11.09.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2634787B | Global Dossier | 30.07.1997 | B2 | JPH08193046 | 30.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6988687 | Global Dossier | 10.09.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU609390B | Global Dossier | 02.05.1991 | B2 | AU7160987 | 28.09.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0259468 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1991 | B1 | EP0259468 | 16.03.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT397084B | 25.01.1994 | B | ATA900787 | 15.06.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1309087 | 20.10.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH672313 | 15.11.1989 | A5 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS270558 | 12.07.1990 | B2 | CS151187 | 14.11.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD258942 | 10.08.1988 | A5 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3608088 | 16.11.1995 | C2 | DE3608088 | 10.09.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3790121D2 | 10.03.1988 | D2 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2004543 | 16.01.1989 | A6 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2189783 | 04.11.1987 | A | GB8704982D0 | 08.04.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR870363 | 30.06.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE59760 | 23.03.1994 | B1 | IE870586L | 07.09.1987 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL81802 | 18.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ219508 | 28.08.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SU1632371 | 28.02.1991 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4886788 | 12.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA871663 | 28.08.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3608088 | 07.03.1986 |