EP0263137 - CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR SWITCHING A MOTOR AND APPLICATION TO THE SPEED VARIATION OF THE CONTROL CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELENE SA 40 Rue Périer F-92129 Montrouge / FR | [1990/31] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE Tour Elf, 2, Place de la Coupole, La Défense 6 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATHAN, Guy 12, avenue Victor Hugo F-92170 Vanves / FR | 02 /
VICAINE, Bernard Appt. 1707 14, villa d'Este F-75648 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Debay, Yves Cabinet Yves Debay, 122 Elysee 2 F-78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | ||
Former [1988/15] | Boillot, Marc ELF AQUITAINE Division Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf F-92078 Paris la Défense Cédex 45 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87902101.2 | 20.03.1987 | [1988/15] | WO1987FR00087 | Priority number, date | FR19860004099 | 21.03.1986 Original published format: FR 8604099 | [1988/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705757 | Date: | 24.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263137 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263137 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/02 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
H02P6/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/15] | Title | German: | KOMMUTIERUNGSSTEUERKREIS EINES MOTORS UND ANWENDUNG FÜR DIE GESCHWINDIGKEITSÄNDERUNG DES STEURKREISES | [1988/15] | English: | CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR SWITCHING A MOTOR AND APPLICATION TO THE SPEED VARIATION OF THE CONTROL CIRCUIT | [1988/15] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE LA COMMUTATION D'UN MOTEUR ET APPLICATION A LA VARIATION DE VITESSE DU CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE | [1988/15] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1987 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.1992 | DE | 02.12.1992 | GB | 02.12.1992 | IT | 02.12.1992 | NL | 02.12.1992 | SE | 02.12.1992 | BE | 31.03.1993 | CH | 31.03.1993 | LI | 31.03.1993 | LU | 31.03.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.12.1992 | |
DE | 02.12.1992 | ||
GB | 02.12.1992 | ||
IT | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 02.12.1992 | |
DE | 02.12.1992 | ||
GB | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | DE | 02.12.1992 | |
GB | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | DE | 02.12.1992 | |
GB | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | DE | 02.12.1992 | |
GB | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | DE | 02.12.1992 | |
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | DE | 02.12.1992 | |
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | NL | 02.12.1992 | Cited in | International search | US3153185 [ ] (HUMMEL JR KARL H); | US3419782 [ ] (SHELDRAKE LEONARD J, et al); | US3769555 [ ] (DOLBACHIAN R, et al); | US3848166 [ ] (JAMIESON J); | US4035699 [ ] (SCHADE WALTER); | US4338551 [ ] (MIZUMOTO KASTUJI) | Examination | EP0089241 | EP0165121 |