EP0257096 - OPTICALLY PUMPED DIVALENT METAL HALIDE LASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 349 Administration Building University of Illinois 506 South Wright Street Urbana Illinois 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 349 Administration Building, University of Illinois, 506 South Wright Street Urbana, Illinois 61801 / US | ||
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS Board of Trustees 506 South Wright Street Urbana, IL 61801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDEN, J., Gary 502 West Taylor Street Mahomet, IL 61853 / US | 02 /
GREENE, Dennis, P. 344 Poyn Loop Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 03 /
KILLEEN, Kevin, P. Star Route Box 605 Sandia, NM 87047 / US | [1988/09] | Application number, filing date | 87902198.8 | 13.02.1987 | [1988/09] | WO1987US00337 | Priority number, date | US19860829690 | 14.02.1986 Original published format: US 829690 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705162 | Date: | 27.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0257096 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/22 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
H01S3/094 (EP,US);
H01S3/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | OPTISCH GEPUMPTE BIVALENTE METALLHALIDLASER | [1988/09] | English: | OPTICALLY PUMPED DIVALENT METAL HALIDE LASERS | [1988/09] | French: | LASERS A HALOGENURE METALLIQUE BIVALENT A POMPAGE OPTIQUE | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 30.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/38] | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4229711 (SCHIMITSCHEK ERHARD J, et al); | [YP]US4607371 (EDEN JAMES G [US], et al) |