EP0260312 - METHOD FOR BLOCKING CALCIUM CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW YORK UNIVERSITY 70 Washington Square South New York, NY 10012 / US | [1988/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LLINAS, Rodolfo, R. 16 Sutton Place, 7A New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
YAROM, Yosef 25 Kubovi Street Jerusalem / IL | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87902204.4 | 23.02.1987 | [1988/12] | WO1987US00413 | Priority number, date | US19860837088 | 06.03.1986 Original published format: US 837088 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705214 | Date: | 11.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260312 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.09.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/045 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BLOCKIEREN VON KALZIUMKANÄLEN | [1988/12] | English: | METHOD FOR BLOCKING CALCIUM CHANNELS | [1988/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE BLOCAGE DE CANAUX DE CALCIUM | [1988/12] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1997 | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1987 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1987 | Search fee paid | 02.11.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 30.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/39] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Therapie, Vol. 32, 1977, pages 355-364; O. SPREUX-VAROQUAUX et al.: "Ethanol et tremblements experimentaux chez la souris et le rat", Summary; figures 2,3; page 362lines 24-33. | [ ] - Fed. Proc., Vol. 36, No. 3, 1977, page 353, Abstract 444; W.D. KNOWLES et al.: "Effects of amesthetics on cerebellar neuroms recorded chromically after harmaline"whole Abstract. | [ ] - Life Sciences, Vol. 34, January 1984, pages 49-56, Pergamon Press, US; M.S. RAPPAPORT et al.: "Ethanol effects on harmaline-induced tremor and increase of cerebellar cyclic GMP", Summary; figures 1,2; pages 51,52, section "Results", page 54last paragraph. | [ ] - Can. J. Physiol. Pharmacol., Vol. 60, No. 5, May 1982, pages 610-614, Nat. Research Council of Canada, J.G. SINCLAIR et al.: "Ethanol effects on the olivocerebellar system", Summary, page 610, section "Introduction"; figure 2; page 612, right-hand column, lines 12-16; page 613, right-hand column, line 10 - page 614, left-hand columnline 6. | [ ] - J. Pharm. Exp. Ther., Vol. 225, No. 8, 1983, pages 571-575, US; S.W. LESLIE et al.: "Inhibition of fast- and slow-phase depolarization-dependent synaptosomal calcium uptake by ethanol", Abstract; table 1; pages 572-573, section "Results"; page 573, right-hand column, line 18 - page 574, left-hand columnline 3. | [ ] - Biochem. Pharmacology, Vol. 32, No. 6, 1983, pages 963-969, Pergamon Press Ltd., GB; M.L. MICHAELIS et al.: "Alcohol and local anesthetic effects on Na dependent Ca2+ fluxes in brain synaptic membrane vesicles", Abstract; figures 2,3,4a,4b; page 965, left-hand column, line 1 - page 965, right-hand column, line 47; page 967, right-hand column, line 50 - page 968, left-hand columnline 2. | [ ] - Soc. Neurosci. Abstr., Vol. 12, No. 1, November 1986, page 174; Abstr. 49.3, R. LLINAS et al.: "Specific blockage of the low threshold calcium channel by high molecular weight alcohols"whole Abstract. | [ ] - Pfluegers Arch, Vol. 414, No. 1, May 1989, pages 31-36, European Journal of Physiology, Springer Verlag, DE, C.M. SINTON et al.: "The effectiveness of different isomers of octanol as blockers of harmalinc-induced tremor", Abstract; page 34, left-hand column, line 9 - page 34, right-hand column, line 27; page 36, left-hand columnlines 7-47. | International search | [X]US2903396 (CLARKE SAUNDERS JOHN, et al); | [X]US3041237 (HOFF DONALD A, et al); | [X]US3778509 (LOYD LEWIS H) | [X] - Merck Index, 9th Ed (1976)page 879 |