Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
08.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] |
25.10.1990 | First examination report | |
08.11.1989 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] |
06.02.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] |
06.02.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] |