Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK580987 | 30.12.1987 | A | DK580987D0 | 05.11.1987 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US83708886 | 06.03.1986 | US8700413 | 23.02.1987 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4897426 | 30.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US34127189 | 20.04.1989 | US83708886 | 06.03.1986 | US21346688 | 29.06.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8705214 | Global Dossier | 11.09.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83708886 | 06.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7206087 | Global Dossier | 28.09.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US83708886 | 06.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0260312 | Global Dossier | 07.11.1989 | A4 | EP0260312 | 23.03.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83708886 | 06.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63500525 | 25.02.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US83708886 | 06.03.1986 |