EP0255543 - ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC REPRODUCTION APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH SELECTIVE SCREENING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1988/06] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSILIBES, George, N. 61 Fonthill Park Rochester, NY 14618 / US | 02 /
DAY, Pierce, B. 13 Hunters Run Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 03 /
HOCKEY, David, Eugene 12 Castleford Road Rochester, NY 14616 / US | 04 /
ROZTOCIL, Toma 518 Leicester Street Caledonia, NY 14423 / US | 05 /
SMITH, Dale 30 Hogan Point Hilton, NY 14468 / US | 06 /
SWAPCEINSKI, John, P. 7549 Dublin Road Bergen, NY 14416 / US | 07 /
STEEVES, John, L. 19 South Goodman Street Rochester, NY 14606 / US | [1988/06] | Representative(s) | Lewandowsky, Klaus, et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/30] |
Former [1988/06] | Lewandowsky, Klaus Dipl.- Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Postfach 600345 W-7000 Stuttgart 60 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87902371.1 | 15.12.1986 | [1988/06] | WO1986US02671 | Priority number, date | US19850809548 | 16.12.1985 Original published format: US 809548 | US19850809549 | 16.12.1985 Original published format: US 809549 | US19860940694 | 11.12.1986 Original published format: US 940694 | [1988/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703709 | Date: | 18.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0255543 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0255543 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/052 | [1988/06] | CPC: |
G03G15/04027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/06] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHES VERVIELFÄLTIGUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN MIT SELEKTIVER RASTERUNG | [1988/06] | English: | ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC REPRODUCTION APPARATUS AND METHOD WITH SELECTIVE SCREENING | [1988/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE REPRODUCTION ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE TRAMES SELECTIVES | [1988/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1987 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 21.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP5993459 ; | FR2547929 [ ]; | US4403257 [ ]; | US4472047 [ ]; | US4451137 [ ] | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 8, No. 211 (p-303) (1648) 26 September 1984, & JP, A, 5993459 (Konishiroku Shashin Kogyo K.K.) 29 May 1984, & JP5993459 A 19840529 |