EP0266389 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO OPTICAL FIBRE SENSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAKIN, John, Philip Firview Whinwhistle Road East Wellow Romsey Hants / GB | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Nicholson, Ronald Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Nicholson, Ronald Intellectual Property Department The Plessey Company plc 2-60 Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87902619.3 | 22.04.1987 | [1988/19] | WO1987GB00265 | Priority number, date | GB19860009732 | 22.04.1986 Original published format: GB 8609732 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706690 | Date: | 05.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266389 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266389 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
G01D5/35303 (EP,US);
G01M11/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/19] | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHE SUCHSYSTEME | [1988/19] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO OPTICAL FIBRE SENSING SYSTEMS | [1988/19] | French: | AMELIORATIONS A DES SYSTEMES DE DETECTION A FIBRES OPTIQUES | [1988/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.1987 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0092367 [ ] (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | GB2122337 [ ] (NAT RES DEV); | US4545253 [ ] (AVICOLA KENNETH [US]) |