EP0292561 - INSTALLATION FOR TREATING TRELLIS PLANTS IN BLOCK-TYPE HOTHOUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAUCHNO-PROIZVODSTVENNOE OBIEDINENIE PO SELSKOKHOZYAISTVENNOMU MASHINOSTROENIJU NPO VISKHOM Dmitrovskoe shosse, 107 Moscow, 127247 / RU | [1988/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALKIN, Mikhail Alexandrovich ul. 800 let Moskvy, 2-1-24 Moscow, 127486 / SU | 02 /
LIPOV, Jury Noievich ul. Vavilova, 56-2-167 Moscow, 117296 / SU | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/48] | Finck, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Postfach 95 01 60 D-81517 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87902868.6 | 29.01.1987 | [1988/48] | WO1987SU00015 | Priority number, date | SU19864142495 | 12.11.1986 Original published format: SU 4142495 | [1988/48] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803364 | Date: | 19.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292561 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 19.05.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
B65H75/403 (EP);
A01G25/095 (EP);
A01G9/247 (EP);
A01M7/0082 (EP);
B65H2701/33 (EP);
B65H2701/34 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON SPALIERPFLANZEN IN FREISTEHENDEN WÄRMEHÄUSERN | [1988/48] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR TREATING TRELLIS PLANTS IN BLOCK-TYPE HOTHOUSES | [1988/48] | French: | EQUIPEMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PLANTES DISPOSEES SUR UN TREILLAGE DANS DES SERRES UNITAIRES | [1988/48] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1988 | Translation filed | 08.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1988 | Search fee paid | 08.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/36] | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1087120 ; | [Y]FR2211177 (AUBRY BAUER ET CIE ETS [FR]); | [Y]GB2007951 (SIMON PIERRE ETS); | [A]US4033554 (SUGIMOTO YUTAKA, et al); | [A]FR2479651 (DIPALMA HUGO [FR]); | [A]DE2856605 (FEDDERSEN AUGUST); | [A]US4074856 (WILLIAMS DAVID, et al) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Woche 8535, 10. Oktober 1985, Klasse P13, Nr. 85215572/35, Derwent Publications LTD, London, GB; & SU-A-10 87 120 (RADUGA TRUST) 23-04-1984, & SU1087120 A 00000000 | International search | [A]SU55745 (GREKOV P I); | [A]SU1187887 (VNII SELSKOKHOZ MASH [SU]); | [A]DE2237343 | [A] - Trudy Vsesojuznogo Selskokhozyaistvennogo Instituta Zaochnago Obrazovania "Avtomatizatsia Tekhnologicheskikh Protsessov Vozdelyvania Ovoschnykh Kultur v Zaschischennom Grunte", Vypusk 144, 1977, Vskhizo (Moscow), M. A. GALKIN "K Voprosu Avtomatizatsu Protsessa Opryskivania Shpalernykh Kultur v Blochnykh Teplitsakh", see pages 81-84 |