EP0263867 - REAGENT FOR CELL SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEPRATECH CORPORATION 305 North MacArthur Boulevard Suite 100 Oklahoma City, OK 73127 / US | [1988/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORN, Allan, R. 7183 Northwest 16th Bethany, OK 73008 / US | [1988/16] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87902933.8 | 25.03.1987 | [1988/16] | WO1987US00628 | Priority number, date | US19860849819 | 09.04.1986 Original published format: US 849819 | [1988/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706233 | Date: | 22.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263867 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.10.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/02, C07F7/08, C07F7/10, C12N5/00 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/569 (EP,US);
B01J20/3204 (EP,US);
B01J20/3219 (EP,US);
B01J20/3257 (EP,US);
B01J20/3259 (EP,US);
B01J20/3263 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/16] | Title | German: | REAGENZ FÜR ZELLTRENNUNG | [1988/16] | English: | REAGENT FOR CELL SEPARATION | [1988/16] | French: | REACTIF POUR SEPARATION CELLULAIRE | [1988/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1987 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1987 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 12.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/13] | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.1989 | 31.03.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2042976 ; | [YP]WO8607281 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]); | [A]WO8303363 (RIESNER DETLEV [DE], et al); | [E]US4681870 (BALINT JR JOSEPH P [US], et al) | [A] - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, vol. 376, 1986, pages 245-257, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V., Amsterdam, NL; M.T.W. HEARN: "Application of 1,1'-carbonyldiimidazole-activated matrices for the purification of proteins" | International search | [X]US4474704 (SAWICKI ROBERT A [US]); | [X]US4644077 (GUPTA GOUTAM [US]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 82, issued 1975 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), LYNN et al. "Chemically Bonded Packings" page 88, col. 2, Abstract 59239f Bonded Stationary Phases Chromatog 1974, 1-11 (Eng). | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 92, issued 1980 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), VOROSHILOVA et al) "Synthesis and Study of Silica Supports" page 371, col 1, Abstract 204090p Kolloidn Zh. 1980 42(2) 223-9 (Russ). | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 102 issued 1985 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), (SKOPENKO et al), "Immobilization of 1,10-Phenanthroline" see page 575 col. 1, Abst. 131417p, Geol., Khim. Biol. Nauki 1984 (11) pg 54-6 (Ukrain). |