EP0270571 - ARRANGEMENT FOR A PORTABLE DATA CARRIER HAVING MULTIPLE APPLICATION FILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1988/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERL, Ewald, Christoph 211 Cherry Tree Lane Middletown, NJ 07748 / US | 02 /
FRANKEL, Oren 52A Raleigh Court, East Ocean Township, NJ 07712 / US | 03 /
ZAHIVI, Avi 120 Donaldson Street Highland Park, NJ 08904 / US | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1988/24] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87903156.5 | 20.04.1987 | [1988/24] | WO1987US00913 | Priority number, date | US19860863974 | 16.05.1986 Original published format: US 863974 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8707063 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0270571 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0270571 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G07F7/08 (KR);
G06K19/06 (KR);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/3555 (EP);
G06Q20/35765 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | ANLAGE FÜR EINEN TRAGBAREN DATENTRÄGER MIT MEHREREN ANWENDUNGSDATENBESTÄNDEN | [1988/24] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR A PORTABLE DATA CARRIER HAVING MULTIPLE APPLICATION FILES | [1988/24] | French: | AGENCEMENT POUR SUPPORTS PORTATIFS DE DONNEES AYANT DES FICHIERS A APPLICATIONS MULTPILES | [1988/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0057602 [ ] (CHALMERS DAVID ARTHUR [GB], et al); | EP0114773 [ ] (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | EP0152024 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | EP0159539 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | EP0193635 [ ] (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) | Examination | WO8707060 |