EP0285612 - MOISTURE REMOVER IN COMPRESSED AIR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.1994 [1994/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNG, Ki Jang 273 Nonhyun-dong, Kangnam-ku Seoul 135-010 / KR | [1988/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87903442.9 | 28.04.1987 | [1988/41] | WO1987KR00005 | Priority number, date | KR19860015606 | 13.10.1986 Original published format: KR 8615606 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8802658 | Date: | 21.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0285612 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285612 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 21.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B01D46/24, F04B39/16 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
B01D45/02 (EP);
B01D46/12 (EP);
B01D51/06 (EP);
B01D53/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1988/41] | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSBESEITIGER IN VERDICHTETEM LUFTSYSTEM | [1988/41] | English: | MOISTURE REMOVER IN COMPRESSED AIR SYSTEM | [1988/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ELIMINATION DE L'HUMIDITE DANS UN SYSTEME A AIR COMPRIME | [1988/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1988 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1148691 ; | [A]US3261146 ; | [A]US2629458 ; | [A]JPS59147621 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Section C, Vol. 8, No. 279, 20 December 1984, C-50257; & JP,A,59 147 621, (HISAMOTO SUZUKI), 24 August 1984., & JP59147621 A 19840824 |