EP0305396 - AN ARRANGEMENT IN EAVE GUTTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB SIBA-VERKEN Box 143 S-570 81 Järnforsen / SE | [1989/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULSSON, Arne Videbrovägen 1 S-570 81 Järnforsen / SE | [1989/10] | Representative(s) | Siebmanns, Hubertus, et al Götalands Patentbyra AB Box 154 561 22 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | Siebmanns, Hubertus, et al Götalands Patentbyra AB Box 154 S-561 22 Huskvarna / SE | Application number, filing date | 87903460.1 | 13.05.1987 | [1989/10] | WO1987SE00237 | Priority number, date | SE19860002205 | 15.05.1986 Original published format: SE 8602205 | [1989/10] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706969 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305396 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305396 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/06 | [1989/10] | CPC: |
E04D13/0725 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/10] | Title | German: | SACHRINNENVORRICHTUNG | [1989/10] | English: | AN ARRANGEMENT IN EAVE GUTTERS | [1989/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CHENEAUX | [1989/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1987 | Translation filed | 04.11.1988 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 04.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 30.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3150851 (RITCHIE DAVID A, et al); | [A]AU518439 |