EP0270612 - AUTOMATIC TWO POSITION LOCKING DEVICE FOR WINDOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KING, Derek 35 Badby Road Daventry, Northamptonshire NN11 4AP / GB | [1988/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Moore, Christopher Mark Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87903734.9 | 12.06.1987 | [1988/24] | WO1987GB00409 | Priority number, date | GB19860014407 | 13.06.1986 Original published format: GB 8614407 | GB19860020762 | 28.08.1986 Original published format: GB 8620762 | GB19870007391 | 27.03.1987 Original published format: GB 8707391 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8707670 | Date: | 17.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0270612 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0270612 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E05C1/10 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
E05C1/10 (EP);
E05B2015/0235 (EP);
E05C1/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE VERRIEGELUNG IN ZWEI POSITIONEN FÜR FENSTER | [1988/24] | English: | AUTOMATIC TWO POSITION LOCKING DEVICE FOR WINDOWS | [1988/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUTOMATIQUE DE BLOCAGE A DEUX POSITIONS POUR FENETRE | [1988/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1988 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 15.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Request for further processing for: | 29.11.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.1992 | BE | 25.11.1992 | CH | 25.11.1992 | DE | 25.11.1992 | FR | 25.11.1992 | IT | 25.11.1992 | LI | 25.11.1992 | NL | 25.11.1992 | SE | 25.11.1992 | LU | 30.06.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 25.11.1992 | |
BE | 25.11.1992 | ||
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
IT | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
NL | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
FR | 16.04.1993 | ||
LU | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.11.1992 | |
BE | 25.11.1992 | ||
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
IT | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
NL | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
FR | 16.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 25.11.1992 | |
BE | 25.11.1992 | ||
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
NL | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
FR | 16.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | BE | 25.11.1992 | |
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
NL | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
FR | 16.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/33] | BE | 25.11.1992 | |
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
NL | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 25.11.1992 | |
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
NL | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 25.11.1992 | |
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
NL | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 25.11.1992 | |
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | CH | 25.11.1992 | |
LI | 25.11.1992 | Cited in | International search | US1943946 [ ] (KENNETH BRAINERD); | US2828991 [ ] (JAN STILGER WLODZIMIERZ) | Examination | FR754353 |