EP0385971 - METHOD FOR FORMING ROAD AND GROUND CONSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.1992 [1992/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RINGESTEN, Björn Box 113 286 01 Örkelljunga / SE | For all designated states BERGE, Olav Pl 3003 S-430 40 Särö / SE | For all designated states BERNTSSON, Leif Tägmästaregatan 10 S-416 52 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states RINGESTEN, Björn Box 113 S-286 01 Örkelljunga / SE | ||
For all designated states BERGE, Olav Pl 3003 S-430 40 Särö / SE | |||
For all designated states BERNTSSON, Leif Tägmästaregatan 10 S-416 52 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Mossmark, Anders, et al Albihn West AB, Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 87904409.7 | 29.05.1987 | [1990/37] | WO1987SE00264 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809412 | Date: | 01.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385971 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E01C3/00 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
E01C3/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BAU VON STRASSEN- UND BODENKONSTRUKTIONEN | [1990/37] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING ROAD AND GROUND CONSTRUCTIONS | [1990/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION DE ROUTES ET DE SOLS | [1990/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1989 | Translation filed | 16.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/27] | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.11.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SE320402 (YTONG AB [SE]); | [Y]DE1759432 (NIETZEL OTTO FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [Y]SE82014812 ; | [X]US3626702 (MONAHAN EDWARD J); | [X]SE410878 (WALLGREN ALF [SE]); | [E]SE85056315 | [Y] - BERNANDER et al Grundlaggningsarbeten - Geoteknik published 1975 by Ingenjorsforlaget (Stockholm) see page 99-104 fig 99 | [Y] - Entreprenad Nr 49 issued 30 November 1981 D EKENSTAM "Spara en Miljon med Fyllnad av Cellplast" page 6, 7, 20. |