EP0317632 - GAS LASER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARUBE, Norio 1-9-28 Minamitsukushino Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87904726.4 | 15.07.1987 | [1989/22] | WO1987JP00511 | Priority number, date | JP19860169546 | 18.07.1986 Original published format: JP 16954686 | [1989/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8800764 | Date: | 28.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317632 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317632 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.01.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/03 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
H01S3/0975 (EP,US);
H01S3/081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/22] | Title | German: | GAS-LASERANORDNUNG | [1989/22] | English: | GAS LASER DEVICE | [1989/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF LASER A GAZ | [1989/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1988 | Translation filed | 07.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1988 | Search fee paid | 07.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1988 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 05.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.05.1992 | GB | 06.08.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [1993/47] | GB | 06.08.1992 | |
FR | 25.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/11] | FR | 25.09.1992 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS3916043B ; | [Y]JPS499993 ; | [Y]JPS58157186 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPS5239393 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS58158985 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS6175576 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS579236B | Examination | JPS499993 | JPS579236B |