EP0278960 - SEQUENTIAL DRAWER SLIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNAPE & VOGT MANUFACTURING COMPANY 2700 Oak Industrial Drive, N.E. Grand Rapids, MI 49505 / US | [1988/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEMENT, Gene, R. 3300 28th Street Grandville, MI 49418 / US | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1988/34] | Robinson, Anthony John Metcalf Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87905093.8 | 22.07.1987 | [1988/34] | WO1987US01740 | Priority number, date | US19860897779 | 18.08.1986 Original published format: US 897779 | [1988/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801144 | Date: | 25.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278960 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278960 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04, F16C29/04 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
A47B88/493 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0016 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0032 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0035 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0059 (EP,US);
A47B2210/007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/34] | Title | German: | SEQUENTIELLE SCHUBLADENFÜHRUNG | [1988/34] | English: | SEQUENTIAL DRAWER SLIDE | [1988/34] | French: | COULISSE DE TIROIR SEQUENTIELLE | [1988/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1988 | Search fee paid | 21.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.11.1993 | CH | 18.11.1993 | FR | 18.11.1993 | IT | 18.11.1993 | LI | 18.11.1993 | NL | 18.11.1993 | SE | 18.11.1993 | LU | 31.07.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/06] | BE | 18.11.1993 | |
CH | 18.11.1993 | ||
IT | 18.11.1993 | ||
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
LU | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 18.11.1993 | |
CH | 18.11.1993 | ||
IT | 18.11.1993 | ||
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 18.11.1993 | |
CH | 18.11.1993 | ||
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | CH | 18.11.1993 | |
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 18.11.1993 | |
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/28] | SE | 18.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1814714 (SELECTA ORGANISATION) | International search | [X]US4469384 (FLER JACK P [CA], et al); | [A]US4370007 (FLER JACK P [CA]); | [A]US4560212 (PAPP JOHN E [US], et al); | [A]US4537450 (BAXTER ALAN R [CA]); | [A]US4272139 (FLER JACK P); | [AP]US4662761 (HOFFMAN KEITH A [US]); | [A]US4549773 (PAPP JOHN E [US], et al) |