EP0277253 - HYDRAULIC PUMP CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIDE, Takao 300-20, Nishi-koiso Oiso-machi Naka-gun Kanagawa-ken 255 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Kentaro 18, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254 / JP | 03 /
SAIGO, Takaichi 23-19, Matsukazedai Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 253 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Katsumi 18, Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254 / JP | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87905290.0 | 15.08.1987 | [1988/32] | WO1987JP00610 | Priority number, date | JP19860191248 | 15.08.1986 Original published format: JP 19124886 | JP19860247085 | 17.10.1986 Original published format: JP 24708586 | JP19860288366 | 03.12.1986 Original published format: JP 28836686 | JP19860302343 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30234386 | [1988/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801349 | Date: | 25.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277253 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277253 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.02.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/06 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
E02F9/2235 (EP,US);
E02F9/2246 (EP,US);
F04B1/324 (EP,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0601 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0605 (EP,US);
F04B2205/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSEINHEIT EINER HYDRAULISCHEN PUMPE | [1988/32] | English: | HYDRAULIC PUMP CONTROL UNIT | [1988/32] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE DE POMPE HYDRAULIQUE | [1988/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1988 | Translation filed | 29.03.1988 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1988 | Search fee paid | 29.03.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 17.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91110985.8 / EP0457365 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Request for further processing for: | 29.06.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]GB2171757 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [AP]DE3611553 (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG); | [A]EP0114646 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) | International search | [X]JPS6241850U ; | [A]JPS6228318B ; | [A]JPS6287631 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]JPS57179387 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS60204987 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) |