EP0277201 - CONTACT-FREE DRAWING PEN (''AIR-BRUSH'') [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAFIC WORLD V.O.F. Brinkheide 12 NL-2913 LV Rotterdam / NL | [1988/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIELISSE, Gijsbertus, Maria, Theodorus Grafic World v.o.f Brinkheide 12 NL-2913 LV Rotterdam / NL | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Baarslag, Aldert D., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Baarslag, Aldert D., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 87905482.3 | 20.08.1987 | [1988/32] | WO1987NL00019 | Priority number, date | NL19860002123 | 20.08.1986 Original published format: NL 8602123 | [1988/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801202 | Date: | 25.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277201 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/06, B43K8/00 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
B05B7/2459 (EP);
B05B7/2435 (EP);
B43K8/006 (EP);
B43K8/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/32] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGFREI ARBEITENDES ZEICHENGERÄT | [1988/32] | English: | CONTACT-FREE DRAWING PEN (''AIR-BRUSH'') | [1988/32] | French: | TIRE-LIGNE SANS CONTACT (''PINCEAU A AIR'') | [1988/32] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1988 | Translation filed | 19.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/35] | 03.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2709217 [ ]; | DE8216437U [ ]; | DE1255006 [ ]; | DE2217162 [ ]; | EP0092359 [ ] |