EP0318508 - ARRANGEMENT FOR THE INSTILLATION OF FLUIDS IN A URETHRA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andersson, Ingvar Pl. 80 S-450 34 Fiskebäckskil / SE | For all designated states WADSTEIN, Jan Karlavägen 67 S-111 45 Stockholm / SE | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Albihn Willquist AB S:t Larsgatan 23 S-582 24 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 87905552.3 | 18.08.1987 | [1989/23] | WO1987SE00361 | Priority number, date | SE19860003511 | 20.08.1986 Original published format: SE 8603511 | [1989/23] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801183 | Date: | 25.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318508 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
A61M29/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM EINTRÖPFELN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN IN DIE HARNRÖHRE | [1989/23] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR THE INSTILLATION OF FLUIDS IN A URETHRA | [1989/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'INSTILLATION DE LIQUIDES DANS UN URETRE | [1989/23] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1988 | Translation filed | 30.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 30.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 19.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/35] | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE267597 ; | [A]DE3204828 |