EP0319545 - ANIMAL GROWTH PROMOTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENZACOR PROPERTIES LIMITED P.O. Box 83 St. Helier, Jersey, Channel Islands / GB | [1989/39] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states YING, Thomas Ko Sai 2 Bridgewater Way Rowville, VIC 3178 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YING, Thomas Ko Sai 2 Bridgewater Way Rowville, VIC 3178 / AU | [1989/39] |
Former [1989/24] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1989/39] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1989/24] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87905570.5 | 17.08.1987 | [1989/24] | WO1987AU00269 | Priority number, date | AU19860007714 | 28.08.1986 Original published format: AU 771486 | [1989/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801512 | Date: | 10.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319545 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319545 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.03.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/54, A61K37/547, A61K37/553, A61K37/62, A61K9/58 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/5073 (EP,US);
A61K38/43 (KR);
A23K20/189 (EP,US);
A23K40/30 (EP,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | TIERWACHSTUMSERREGER | [1989/24] | English: | ANIMAL GROWTH PROMOTANT | [1989/24] | French: | PROMOTEUR DE CROISSANCE ANIMALE | [1989/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1989 | Search fee paid | 27.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 28.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0184754 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0134703 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) | International search | [X]AU504584B (JOHNSON & JOHNSON); | [X]AU516072B (JOHNSON & JOHNSON); | [X]AU268704B ; | [X]AU1029976 (RICHTER P A, et al); | [X]US4447412 (BILTON GERALD L [US]); | [X]US3803304 (ANTONIDES H); | [X]FR2419722 (BAYER ITALIA SPA [IT]) |