Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0324745 | Global Dossier | 11.01.1995 | B1 | EP0324745 | 26.07.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE8700401 | 01.09.1987 | DE3631169 | 11.09.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3750988D1 | 02.03.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3750988 | 01.09.1987 | DE8700401 | 01.09.1987 | DE3631169 | 11.09.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5663203 | 02.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US74484091 | 13.08.1991 | US38171189 | 11.05.1989 | DE3631169 | 11.09.1986 | US9064993 | 12.07.1993 | US35017194 | 30.11.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8801867 | Global Dossier | 24.03.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3631169 | 11.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE116856T | 15.01.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3631169 | 11.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3631169 | 24.03.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3631169 | 11.09.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH01503780 | 21.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3631169 | 11.09.1986 |