EP0282520 - NON-VOLATILE MEMORY WITH FLOATING GRID AND WITHOUT THICK OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni F-94250 Gentilly / FR | ||
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states THOMSON SEMICONDUCTEURS 101, bld Murat F-75016 - Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGEMONT, Albert 26, chemin de Mausec F-38700 La Tronche / FR | [1988/38] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/38] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87905766.9 | 11.09.1987 | [1988/38] | WO1987FR00353 | Priority number, date | FR19860012940 | 16.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8612940 | [1988/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8802172 | Date: | 24.03.1988 | [1988/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0282520 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0282520 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/04 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
G11C16/0491 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/38] | G11C17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/27] |
Former [1988/38] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | NICHTFLÜCHTIGER SPEICHER MIT ISOLIERTEM GATE OHNE DICKES OXID | [1988/38] | English: | NON-VOLATILE MEMORY WITH FLOATING GRID AND WITHOUT THICK OXIDE | [1988/38] | French: | MEMOIRE NON-VOLATILE A GRILLE FLOTTANTE SANS OXYDE EPAIS | [1988/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.07.1992 | [1993/14] | Cited in | International search | US4180826 [ ] (SHAPPIR JOSEPH [US]); | EP0006510 [ ] (IBM [US]); | US4258466 [ ] (KUO CHANG-KIANG, et al); | US4361847 [ ] (HARARI ELIYAHOU); | US4384349 [ ] (MCELROY D J) |