EP0320506 - A REVERSIBLE BOTTOM VALVE CARTRIDGE WITH AN ORIENTING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCO CORPORATION OF INDIANA 21001 Van Born Road Taylor Michigan 48180 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states MASCO CORPORATION 21001 Van Born Road Taylor Michigan 48180 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTTO, Joe, D. 6342 Behner Reach Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Ewald Oppermann & Oppermann Patentanwälte Am Wiesengrund 35 63075 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Oppermann, Ewald, Dipl.-Ing. Am Wiesengrund 35 D-63075 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 87905968.1 | 25.06.1987 | [1989/25] | WO1987US01561 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8810386 | Date: | 29.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0320506 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0320506 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/06, F16K25/00 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
F16K27/045 (EP,US);
F16K19/006 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5196 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7504 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/25] | Title | German: | UMKEHRBARE BODENVENTIL-KARTUSCHE MIT EINER AUSRICHTVORRICHTUNG | [1993/08] | English: | A REVERSIBLE BOTTOM VALVE CARTRIDGE WITH AN ORIENTING MECHANISM | [1989/25] | French: | SOUPAPE A CARTOUCHE A FOND REVERSIBLE AVEC MECANISME D'ORIENTATION | [1989/25] |
Former [1989/25] | UMKEHRBARES BODENVENTIL-KARTUSCHE MIT EINER AUSRICHTVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1989 | Search fee paid | 24.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/25] | 01.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3089505 (ROBERT FORSTER); | [A]US3674048 (MANOOGIAN ALEX, et al); | [A]US4005728 (THORP RALPH E); | [A]US4243063 (PARKISON RICHARD G [US]); | [A]US4362186 (PARKISON RICHARD G, et al); | [A]US4378029 (PARKISON RICHARD G); | [A]US4423752 (PSAROUTHAKIS JOHN [US]); | [A]US4557288 (BOTNICK IRLIN H [US]); | [A]US4584723 (HUSSAUF WALTER [CH]); | [A]US4662388 (EATON RODGER D [US], et al); | [AE]US4676270 (KNAPP ALFONS [DE], et al) | Examination | WO8607431 |