EP0323962 - POLYURETHANE-FORMING BINDER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING CERTAIN CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AS BENCH LIFE EXTENDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASHLAND OIL, INC. P.O.Box 2219 Columbus, OH 43216 / US | [1989/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FECHTER, Robert, B. 487 Riley Avenue Worthington, OH 43085 / US | 02 /
GARDIKES, John, J. 6756 Masefield Worthington, OH 43085 / US | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87905987.1 | 20.08.1987 | [1989/29] | WO1987US02100 | Priority number, date | US19860899696 | 25.08.1986 Original published format: US 899696 | [1989/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801545 | Date: | 10.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323962 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/22, B22C9/02 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
C08G18/089 (EP,US);
B22C1/2273 (EP,US);
C08G18/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1989/29] | Title | German: | POLYURETHANBILDENDE BINDEMITTELZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND BESTIMMTE KARBONSÄUREN ALS LAGERVERLÄNGERUNGSMITTEL | [1989/29] | English: | POLYURETHANE-FORMING BINDER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING CERTAIN CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AS BENCH LIFE EXTENDERS | [1989/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS LIANTES FORMANT DU POLYURETHANE CONTENANT CERTAINS ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES PROLONGEANT LA DUREE DE STOCKAGE | [1989/29] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1989 | Search fee paid | 16.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 16.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 28.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/15] | 13.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.11.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8503302 (ASHLAND OIL INC [US]) | International search | [X]US3431969 (ROBINS JANIS); | [Y]US3485797 (ROBINS JANIS); | [X]US4179427 (GARDIKES JOHN J [US]); | [A]US4452927 (MATSUSHIMA NORIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4459374 (NISHIMURA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4546124 (LAITAR ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]US4602069 (DUNNAVANT WILLIAM R [US], et al) |