EP0375676 - A DRAINAGE TUBE FOR SINUS MAXILLARIS, A MEANS FOR ITS INSERTION AND A MEANS FOR MAKING A HOLE FOR ITS POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERG, Olle Elfviksvägen 66 S-181 47 Lidingö / SE | For all designated states LEJDEBORN, Lars Västergöksvägen 70 S-162 24 Vällingby / SE | [1990/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Ström, Tore, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 87906276.8 | 19.08.1987 | [1990/27] | WO1987SE00364 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901350 | Date: | 23.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375676 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
A61M27/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1990/27] | Title | German: | DRAINAGERÖHRCHEN FÜR DIE KIEFERNHÖHLE, VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSETZEN DESSELBEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES LOCHES ZUM POSITIONIEREN DESSELBEN | [1990/27] | English: | A DRAINAGE TUBE FOR SINUS MAXILLARIS, A MEANS FOR ITS INSERTION AND A MEANS FOR MAKING A HOLE FOR ITS POSITIONING | [1990/27] | French: | TUBE DE DRAINAGE DU SINUS MAXILLAIRE, DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION ET DISPOSITIF DE PER AGE D'UN TROU DESTINE A SON POSITIONNEMENT | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.1989 | Translation filed | 03.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/34] | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SE416881 (WERGE ANDERS CARL EDWARD); | [E]SE450996 (BERG OLLE, et al); | [A]DE2355644 (AKIYAMA TAICHIRO); | [A]EP0137528 (FUNDATECH SA [CH]); | [A]US2452813 (WADE STANLEY M); | [A]US3807409 (PAPARELLA M, et al); | [A]US3871380 (HEROS RICARDO J) |