EP0279854 - BINARY TREE PARALLEL PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY 411 Low Memorial Library, 100 16th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY 411 Low Memorial Library, 100 16th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | ||
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK 110 Low Memorial Library New York, NY 10027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLFO, Salvatore, J. 80 Kenilworth Road Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | 02 /
MIRANKER, Daniel, P. 7600 Woodhollow Drive Apt. 1201 Austin, TX 78731 / US | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87906327.9 | 27.08.1987 | [1988/35] | WO1987US02107 | Priority number, date | US19860902547 | 02.09.1986 Original published format: US 902547 | [1988/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801771 | Date: | 10.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279854 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279854 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/44, G06F15/40 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G06F11/0724 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F15/17337 (EP,US);
G06F15/8023 (EP,US);
G06F16/90348 (EP,US);
G06F9/4494 (EP,US);
G06N5/00 (EP,US);
G06F11/0757 (EP,US);
G06F11/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/35] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/35] | Title | German: | PARALLELPROZESSOR MIT BINÄRER BAUMSTRUKTUR | [1988/35] | English: | BINARY TREE PARALLEL PROCESSOR | [1988/35] | French: | PROCESSEUR PARALLELE A CONFIGURATION EN ARBRE BINAIRE | [1988/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1988 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1984 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PARALLEL PROCESSING, Livermore, 21st-24th August 1984, pages 83-91, IEEE, New York, US; A. GUPTA: "Implementing OPS5 production systems on DADO" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1984 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PARALLEL PROCESSING, Livermore, 21st-24th August 1984, pages 74-82, IEEE, New York, US; S.J. STOLFO et al.: "DADO: A parallel processor for expert systems" | International search | [A]US4251861 (MAGO GYULA A); | [A]US4344134 (BARNES GEORGE H); | [A]US4345309 (ARULPRAGASAM JEGA A, et al); | [A]US4435758 (LORIE RAYMOND A [US], et al); | [Y]US4543630 (NECHES PHILIP M [US]); | [X]US4583164 (TOLLE DONALD M [US]); | [AP]US4622632 (TANIMOTO STEVEN L [US], et al) |