EP0289530 - TRAILER TRACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jürgens, Walter, Dr. Ing. Horbacher Strasse 313 D-52072 Aachen / DE | [1988/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/45] | Application number, filing date | 87906423.6 | 06.10.1987 | [1988/45] | WO1987EP00573 | Priority number, date | DE19863634385 | 09.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3634385 | [1988/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803096 | Date: | 05.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289530 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289530 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/00 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
B60D1/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | ANHÄNGEZUGVORRICHTUNG | [1988/45] | English: | TRAILER TRACTION DEVICE | [1988/45] | French: | DISPOSITF DE TRACTION DE REMORQUE | [1988/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1988 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 14.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 19.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.1992 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 17.07.1992 | Date of receipt | 12.08.1992 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.1990 | 31.10.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.1991 | 15.03.1991 | 04   M02   Fee paid on   26.03.1991 | 31.10.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.1992 | 31.10.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.03.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.05.1993 | GB | 05.05.1993 | NL | 05.05.1993 | SE | 05.05.1993 | AT | 06.10.1993 | CH | 31.10.1993 | LI | 31.10.1993 | LU | 31.10.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/15] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
AT | 06.10.1993 | ||
CH | 31.10.1993 | ||
LI | 31.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.10.1993 | ||
LI | 31.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
GB | 05.05.1993 | ||
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | NL | 05.05.1993 | |
SE | 05.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | NL | 05.05.1993 | Cited in | International search | EP0160934 [ ] (JURGENS WALTER DR ING); | EP0231551 [ ] (TOBO MADE BV [NL]) |