EP0315650 - PURIFICATION OF RECOMBINANT INTERLEUKIN-1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunex Corporation 51 University Street Seattle Washington 98101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION 51 University Street Seattle Washington 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRONHEIM, Shirley R. 11526 36th Street, NE Seattle, WA 98125 / US | [1993/10] |
Former [1989/20] | 01 /
KRONHEIM, Shirley, R. 11526 36th Street, NE Seattle, WA 98125 / US | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87906498.8 | 27.08.1987 | [1989/20] | WO1987US02140 | Priority number, date | US19860908426 | 04.09.1986 Original published format: US 908426 | [1989/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801624 | Date: | 10.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315650 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315650 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/00, C07K3/20, C07K3/28, C12P21/00 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/545 (EP,US);
Y10S435/803 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/20] | Title | German: | REINIGUNG VON REKOMBINANTEM INTERLEUKIN-1 | [1989/20] | English: | PURIFICATION OF RECOMBINANT INTERLEUKIN-1 | [1989/20] | French: | PURIFICATION D'INTERLEUKINE-1 RECOMBINANTE | [1989/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1989 | Search fee paid | 21.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 21.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0165654 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) | [XP] - BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 4, no. 12, December 1986, pages 1078-1082, New York, US; S.R. KRONHEIM et al.: "Purification and characterization of human interleukin-1 expressed in Escherichia coli" | International search | [X] - Nature, Vol. 315, issued June 1985, Cloning, Seqeunce and Expression of Two District Human Inter Leukin-1 Complementary DNAs," (March), pg. 641-47, (see pg. 644). | [X] - Journal of Immunology, Vol. 136, issued April 1986, Recombinant Human Interleukin 1 alpha -: Purification and Biological Characterization", (GUBLER), p 2492 (see pg. 2492-93). | [X] - Journal of Immunology, Vol. 136, issued May 1986, Purification to Homogeneity and NH2 - Terminal Amino Acid Sequence of a Novel Interleukin-1 Species Derived from a Human B-Cell Line", (RIMSKY), page 3304-10. | [AP] - Nucleic Acid Research, Vol. 14, issued October 1986, "Genomic Sequence for Human Prointerleukin 1 beta: Possible Evelution from a Reverse Transcribed Pro-Interleukin 1 alpha Gene", (CLARK) page 7897-14. | [AP] - Journal of Immunology, Vol. 137, issued December 1986, "Two Inter Leukin 1 Genes in the Mouse. Cloning and Expression of the cDNA for Murine Interleukin 1beta", (GRAY), pages 3644-48. | [X] - Biochemistry, Vol. 25, issued June 1986, Purification and Biochemical Characterization of Two Distinct Human Interleukins-1 from the Myelomonocytic THP-1 Cell Line", (MATSUSHIMA), pages 3424-29 | [A] - Journal Experimental Medicine, Vol. 162, issued September 1985, "Amino Acid Sequence Analysis of Human Interleukin 1 (IL-1): Evidence for Biochemically Distinct Froms of IL-1, (CAMERON), pages 790-801 | [AP] - Journal Chromatography, Vol. 387, issued January 1987, "Chromatofocusing of N-Terminally Processed Froms of Protein", (WINFIELD), pages 290-300. | [X] - Nucleic Acids Research, Vol. 14, issued April 1986, "Complete Nucleotide Sequence of the Gene for Human Interleukin 1 alpha", (FURUTANI), pages 3167-79. | Examination | - BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 4, no. 12, December 1986, New York, US; S.R. KRONHEIM et al.: "Purification and characterization of human interleukin-1 expressed in Escherichia coli", pages 1078-1082 | - NATURE, VOL. 315, JUNE 20, 1985; C.J. MARCH ET AL. "CLONING, SEQUENCE AND EXPRESSION OF TWO DISTINCT HUMAN INTER LEUKIN-1 COMPLEMENTARY DNAs", PAGES 641-647 | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, VOL. 136, APRIL 07, 1986; U. GUBLER ET AL. "RECOMBINANT HUMAN INTERLEUKIN 1 alpha: PURIFICATION AND BIOLOGICAL CHARACTERIZATION", PAGE 2492 | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, VOL. 136, MAY 01, 1986; L. RIMSKY ET AL. "PURIFICATION TO HOMOGENEOTY AND NH2-TERMAINAL AMINO ACID SEQUENCE OF A NOVEL INTERLEUKIN 1 SPECIES DERIVED FROM A HUMAN B-CELL LINE", PAGES 3304-3310 | - NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, VOL. 14, NO. 20, OCTOBER 1986; B.D. CLARK ET AL. "GENOMIC SEQUENCE FOR HUMAN PROINTERLEUKIN 1 BETA: POSSIBLE EVELUTION FROM A REVERSE TRANSCRIBED PROINTERLEUKIN 1 ALPHA GENE", PAGES 7897-7914 | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, VOL. 137, NO. 11, DECEMBER 01, 1986; P.W. GRAY ET AL. "TWO INTER LEUKIN 1 GENES IN THE MOUSE: CLONING AND EXPRESSION OF THE cDNA FOR MURINE INTERLEUKIN 1beta", PAGES 3644-3648 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, VOL. 25, NO. 17, JUNE 1986; K. MATSUSHIMA ET AL. "PURIFICATION AND BIOCHEMICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF TWO DISTINCT HUMAN INTERLEUKINS 1 FROM THE MYELOMONOCYTIC THP-1 CELL LINE", PAGES 3424-3429 | - JOURNAL CHROMATOGRAPHY, VOL. 387, JANUARY 30, 1987; P.T. WINGFIELD ET AL. "CHROMATOFOCUSING OF N-TERMINALLY PRCESSED FORMS OF PROTEINS", PAGES 290-300 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, VOL. 14, NO. 8, APRIL 1986; Y. FURUTANI ET AL. "COMPLETE NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF THE GENE FOR HUMAN INTERLEUKING 1 ALPHA", PAGES 3167-3179 |