EP0325610 - FLAME-RESISTANT COTTON BLEND FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burlington Industries, Inc. 3330 West Friendly Avenue Greensboro North Carolina 27420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For all designated states Burlington Industries, Inc. 3330 West Friendly Avenue Greensboro North Carolina 27420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSER, Peter, J. 4 Holly Crest Court Greensboro, NC 27410 / US | 02 /
TRIPLETT, Benny, L. 2416 Carlford Road Pleasant Garden, NC 27313 / US | 03 /
SUJARIT, Chumpon 1202 Arrowhead Court High Point, NC 27260 / US | 04 /
HANSEN, John, H. 5520 Guida Drive Greensboro, NC 20410 / US | 05 /
JOHNSON, James, R. 1315 Easthurst Road McLeansville, NC 27310 / US | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Miller, Joseph, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | [1991/35] |
Former [1991/19] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [1989/31] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87906715.5 | 25.09.1987 | [1989/31] | WO1987US02432 | Priority number, date | US19860911720 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: US 911720 | US19860923965 | 28.10.1986 Original published format: US 923965 | [1989/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8802283 | Date: | 07.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325610 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325610 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/244, D06M13/282, D06M13/432, D06M15/43 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
D06M15/431 (EP);
D06M13/288 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/31] | B05D3/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/31] | Title | German: | FLAMMWIDRIGE BAUMWOLLMISCHGEWEBE | [1989/31] | English: | FLAME-RESISTANT COTTON BLEND FABRICS | [1989/31] | French: | TISSUS EN COTON MELANGE RESISTANT AUX FLAMMES | [1989/31] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.1989 | Search fee paid | 22.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 18.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.1994 | BE | 06.04.1994 | CH | 06.04.1994 | DE | 06.04.1994 | FR | 06.04.1994 | IT | 06.04.1994 | LI | 06.04.1994 | NL | 06.04.1994 | SE | 06.04.1994 | GB | 25.09.1994 | LU | 30.09.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
SE | 06.04.1994 | ||
FR | 02.09.1994 | ||
GB | 25.09.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
FR | 02.09.1994 | ||
GB | 25.09.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
FR | 02.09.1994 | ||
GB | 25.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/44] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
FR | 02.09.1994 | ||
GB | 25.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
FR | 02.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
FR | 02.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/08] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
FR | 02.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
DE | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 06.04.1994 | |
LI | 06.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - AMERICAN DYESTUFF REPORTER, vol. 65, no. 21, January 1976, pages 33,34,63; S.L. VAIL et al.: "Topping of THPOH-NH3 fire-retardant finishes" | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF FIRE RETARDANT CHEMISTRY, vol. 6, August 1979, pages 149-166, Wesport, US; R.H. BARKER et al.: "Calorimetric study of polyester/cotton blend fabrics. III. Effects of binary retardant systems" | International search | [A]US3897584 (SWIDLER RONALD, et al); | [A]US3974310 (MISCHUTIN VLADIMIR); | [A]US4166897 (DATE MASAKAZU [JP], et al); | [A]US4448817 (BENISEK LADISLAV [GB], et al); | [A]US4494951 (COLE ROBERT [GB], et al) |