EP0293477 - OVERLOCK SEWING DEVICE FOR USE IN SEWING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORI, Katsuji 12-2, Chidori-cho 3-chome Ogaki-shi Gifo 503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states MORI, Katsuji 12-2, Chidori-cho 3-chome Ogaki-shi Gifo 503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Mikio 12-2, Chidori-cho 3-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu 503 / JP | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1988/49] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 87906944.1 | 27.10.1987 | [1988/49] | WO1987JP00823 | Priority number, date | JP19860260890 | 31.10.1986 Original published format: JP 26089086 | [1988/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803187 | Date: | 05.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293477 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D05B1/20 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
D05B1/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/49] | Title | German: | HILFSVORRICHTUNG ZUM NÄHEN VON ÜBERWENDLICHNÄHTEN AUF NÄHMASCHINEN | [1988/49] | English: | OVERLOCK SEWING DEVICE FOR USE IN SEWING MACHINE | [1988/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUTURE OVERLOCK POUR MACHINE A COUDRE | [1988/49] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1988 | Translation filed | 24.06.1988 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1988 | Search fee paid | 24.06.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 28.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/24] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [X]JPS5928993 (MORI KATSUJI); | [A]JPS5964091U |