EP0290501 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CHIPS EMPLOYING A POLYMER FILM OVERLAY LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICHELBERGER, Charles, William 1256 Waverly Place Schenectady, NY 12308 / US | 02 /
WOJNAROWSKI, Robert, John 102 Hatlee Road, RD 6 Ballston Lake, NY 12019 / US | 03 /
WELLES, Kenneth, Brakeley, II 315 Division Street Schenectady, NY 12304 / US | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/44] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/46] | Kennington, Eric Alasdair London Patent Operation GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNICAL SERVICES CO. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87906964.9 | 28.09.1987 | [1988/46] | WO1987US02501 | Priority number, date | US19860912458 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: US 912458 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8802551 | Date: | 07.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290501 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290501 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56, H01L23/28, B29C51/16 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
H01L21/56 (EP,KR);
H01L21/67121 (EP);
H01L23/3164 (EP);
H01L23/5389 (EP);
H01L24/24 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L24/76 (EP);
H01L24/82 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
H01L2224/2402 (EP);
H01L2224/2919 (EP);
H01L2224/29298 (EP);
H01L2224/83192 (EP);
H01L2224/8385 (EP);
H01L2924/00011 (EP);
H01L2924/00013 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01014 (EP);
H01L2924/01024 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01033 (EP);
H01L2924/0665 (EP);
H01L2924/07802 (EP);
H01L2924/12042 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00011, H01L2224/29298 (EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29199 (EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/2929 (EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29299 (EP);
H01L2924/0665, H01L2924/00, H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/29099 (EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND APPARAT ZUM PACKEN INTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGSCHIPS MIT EINER POLYMERFILM-BEDECKUNGSSCHICHT | [1988/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PACKAGING INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CHIPS EMPLOYING A POLYMER FILM OVERLAY LAYER | [1988/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EMBALLAGE DE PUCES A CIRCUIT INTEGRES UTILISANT UNE COUCHE DE COUVERTURE EN FILM POLYMERE | [1988/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1988 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2915923 (ILLIG MASCHINENBAU ADOLF); | [A]DE2210475 (HERZOG HILMAR); | [A]US4388132 (HOGE CARL E, et al); | [A]JPS59104907 ; | [A]JPS6015124 ; | [A]US4052241 (WALTER WILLIAM J); | [A]EP0152334 (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US]); | [A]JPS6156419 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841013), vol. 008, no. 224, Database accession no. (M - 331)<1661> , & JP59104907 A 19840618 (TOPPAN INSATSU K.K.) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850607), vol. 009, no. 132, Database accession no. (M - 385)<1855> , & JP60015124 A 19850125 (RIKITOSHI NAKANO) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860802), vol. 010, no. 221, Database accession no. (E - 424)<2277> , & JP61056419 A 19860322 (FUJITSU LTD) |