EP0287684 - NEGATIVE FEEDBACK CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKI, Shinji Nisei Biru 503 3-33-2, Izumi-cho Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185 / JP | 02 /
MATSUBARA, Shunsuke Idemitsu Nakano Shataku B-201 2-29-12, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164 / JP | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87907132.2 | 29.10.1987 | [1988/43] | WO1987JP00830 | Priority number, date | JP19860255748 | 29.10.1986 Original published format: JP 25574886 | [1988/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803282 | Date: | 05.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0287684 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0287684 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/36 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
G05B11/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/43] | Title | German: | GEGENKOPPLUNGSREGELSYSTEM | [1992/32] | English: | NEGATIVE FEEDBACK CONTROL SYSTEM | [1988/43] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE A REACTION NEGATIVE | [1988/43] |
Former [1988/43] | NEGATIVES RÜCKSPRACHEREGELSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1988 | Translation filed | 14.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.1988 | Search fee paid | 14.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 25.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.08.1992 | GB | 05.11.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [1993/48] | GB | 05.11.1992 | |
FR | 24.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | FR | 24.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036437 (SULZER AG [CH]) | International search | [A]JPS5719804 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS54181 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS575703U ; | [A]JPS56132612 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS59109864 (FANUC LTD) | Examination | JPS54181 | JPS575703U |